FL S0428 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Community Violence Intervention and Prevention Grant Program within the Department of Children and Families; authorizing the department to award grants, subject to legislative appropriation, to certain organizations and entities; prohibiting the department from requiring grant recipients to participate in certain activities as a condition of receiving a grant; prohibiting grant funds from reverting to the general budget of specified entities, etc.
Title
Community Violence Intervention and Prevention Grant Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H403 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/428 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/428/BillText/Filed/HTML |