FL S0486 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Laid on Table -SJ 913
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Laid on Table -SJ 913
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Including as an additional basis for subjecting a person to the jurisdiction of the courts of this state provisions which state that a person submits to the jurisdiction of the courts of this state by entering into a contract that designates the law of this state as the law governing the contract and that contains a provision by which such person agrees to submit to the jurisdiction of the courts of this state; clarifying that an arbitral tribunal receiving a request for an interim measure to preserve evidence in a dispute governed by the Florida International Commercial Arbitration Act need consider only to the extent appropriate the potential harm that may occur if the measure is not awarded or the possibility that the requesting party will succeed on the merits of the claim; revising application dates of provisions relating to the jurisdiction of the courts, etc.
Title
Jurisdiction of the Courts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Laid on Table -SJ 913 | |
2012-03-07 | Read 2nd time -SJ 913 | |
2012-03-05 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/12 | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2012-03-01 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 726 | |
2012-01-24 | Now in Budget -SJ 263 | |
2012-01-24 | Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 263 | |
2012-01-19 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations, 01/24/12, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-13 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations | |
2012-01-13 | Now in Budget -SJ 135 | |
2012-01-12 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 135 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 44 | |
2011-12-22 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/12/12, 10:15 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-12-07 | Now in Judiciary -SJ 111 | |
2011-12-07 | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 111 | |
2011-11-22 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 12/07/11, 9:30 am, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2011-11-02 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Budget -SJ 44 | |
2011-10-06 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
48 | 193 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
684 | 0019 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
684 | 0026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
685 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
685 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/486 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0486/BillText/Filed/HTML |