FL S0486 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the amount of income that is exempt from the corporate income tax; increasing the amount of income that is exempt from the franchise tax imposed on banks and savings associations, etc.
Title
Tax-exempt Income
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/486 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0486/BillText/Filed/HTML |