FL S0486 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the school's board of trustees to change the name of the school, etc.
Title
Florida School for Competitive Academics
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-10 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Committee on Education |
2024-01-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 01/24/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Education |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 01/10/24, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-11-28 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S250 (Similar To) 2023-12-05 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H1157 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
H1157 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee