FL S0502 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Chapter No. 2017-3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Chapter No. 2017-3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting provisions that have expired, have become obsolete, have had their effect, have served their purpose, or have been impliedly repealed or superseded, etc.
Title
Florida Statutes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Chapter No. 2017-3 | |
2017-04-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-31 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2017-03-23 | House | Passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-22 | House | Substituted for HB 7015 |
2017-03-16 | House | Received |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/22/17 |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2017-03-08 | House | In Messages |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/17 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/22/17, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7015 (Same As) 2017-03-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 502 (Ch. 2017-3)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 796 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 595 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
190 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 619 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 985 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
253 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9936 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 545 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 613 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 4592 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 3071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 925 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 3025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 0046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 458 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 83 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 79 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
571 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
625 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 0629 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 42392 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6562 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 216 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 960 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 20041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
832 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 0356 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
932 | 7055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |