FL S0504 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing certification and training requirements for licensed electrologists who use laser or pulsed-light devices in hair removal, etc.
Title
Laser Hair Removal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/20/16, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-12 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 01/13/16, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2015-12-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-12-01 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 12/01/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2015-10-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0591 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
478 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |