FL S0534 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 369 (Ch. 2015-172)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 369 (Ch. 2015-172)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Transportation and certain employers to display human trafficking public awareness signs at specified locations; providing civil penalties for violations, etc.
Title
Human Trafficking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 369 (Ch. 2015-172) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 369 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/15 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/09/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-03-24 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/23/15, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/12/15, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Appropriations |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0369 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - Chapter No. 2015-172