FL S0568 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the terms "ambulance service provider" and "nonparticipating ambulance service provider"; requiring certain health insurers to reimburse nonparticipating ambulance service providers at a specified rate for providing ground ambulance services; prohibiting certain cost-sharing responsibilities paid from exceeding a certain amount; requiring certain health maintenance contracts to require a health maintenance organization to reimburse out-of-network ambulance service providers at a specified rate for providing covered services, etc.
Title
Coverage for Out-of-network Ground Ambulance Emergency Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-09 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2024-01-17 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Now in Health Policy |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/09/24, 4:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-12-05 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Rules |
2023-11-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H639 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 42398 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6699 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31078 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |