FL S0580 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Department of Elderly Affairs to develop and implement a public education program relating to screening for Alzheimer's disease. Provides criteria for awarding grants. Provides a definition. Requires grant recipients to submit an evaluation of certain activities to the department. Authorizes the department to provide technical support, etc.
Title
Alzheimer's Disease [SPSC]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0053 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages | |
2010-04-23 | In Messages | |
2010-04-22 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00741; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00741 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00689 | |
2010-04-16 | Withdrawn from Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00635; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2010-04-09 | Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00525 | |
2010-04-08 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-06 | CS by Health and Human Services Appropriations; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00525; CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -SJ 00531 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Appropriations, 04/06/10, 3:15 pm, 110-S | |
2010-03-04 | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00189; Now in Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00189 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health and Human Services Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00045; On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/04/10, 8:00 am, 401-S | |
2010-03-01 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/04/10, 8:00 am, 401-S | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health and Human Services Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2009-10-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0705 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Appropriations (CGHC)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0400 | 1755 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0400 | 6045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0429 | 178 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0430 | 5025 | New Code | See Bill Text |