FL S0602 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing certain preregistered voter registration applicants to vote in the presidential preference primary; prohibiting such persons from voting on any other race, amendment, or ballot measure on the ballot; providing that such persons are not considered electors for purposes of the Florida Election Code, etc.
Title
Presidential Preference Primary
Sponsors
Sen. Rene Garcia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0817 (Same As) 2017-03-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
97 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/602 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0602/BillText/Filed/HTML |