FL S0612 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain members of the Special Risk Class from being reemployed or contracting with the same employer from which the member retired. Extends the period of time during which certain Special Risk Class members may participate in the Florida Retirement System Deferred Retirement Option Program, etc.
Title
Special Risk Class/DROP [WPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-04-16 | Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00636 | |
2010-04-15 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-14 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00636; CS read 1st time on 04/16/10 -SJ 00637 | |
2010-04-09 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/14/10, 1:00 pm, 110-S | |
2010-03-18 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00269 | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 00269 | |
2010-03-12 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/17/10, 3:15 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Criminal Justice; Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00047; On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/03/10, 10:00 am, 37-S; Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Criminal Justice (733196); YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00162; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments); Now in Community Affairs -SJ 00162 | |
2010-02-08 | Now in Community Affairs | |
2010-02-03 | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Criminal Justice (733196); YEAS 8 NAYS 0; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) | |
2010-01-22 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/03/10, 10:00 am, 37-S | |
2009-12-17 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2009-11-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0249 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)