FL S0618 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Redefining the term "league" to include Major League Soccer; providing that a previously certified applicant is not eligible for an additional certification under certain circumstances; requiring the Department of Economic Opportunity to reserve two facility certifications for new Major League Soccer franchises, etc.
Title
Professional Sports Franchises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 04/07/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0887 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/618 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0618/BillText/Filed/HTML |