FL S0652 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the removal of a habitual traffic offender designation upon proof of compliance with specified statutory provisions, etc.
Title
Habitual Traffic Offender Designations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/13/14, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0101 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/652 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0652/BillText/Filed/HTML |