FL S0656 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 149
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 149
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the maximum estimated construction cost of construction projects for which a governmental entity may enter into a continuing contract; revising the definition of the term "continuing contract" to increase the maximum dollar value of such contract, to require the department, beginning on a specified date and annually thereafter, to adjust the maximum dollar value allowed under such contracts using a specified index, and to publish the new dollar value on its website, etc.
Title
Continuing Contracts
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Sen. Nick DiCeglie [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 149 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 149 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-02-15 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government read 1st time |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/13/24, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2024-02-01 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H149 (Similar To) 2024-03-01 - Ordered enrolled
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
255 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |