FL S0666 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Defining and redefining terms relating to veterinary medical practice, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterinary Medicine

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateNow in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateFavorable by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-02-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/04/19, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Agriculture; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
2019-02-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H835 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4650276Amended CodeSee Bill Text
474202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4742165Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback