FL S0666 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Chapter No. 2023-46
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Chapter No. 2023-46
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the address that certain candidates must provide on the form of candidate oath; revising the address that judicial candidates must provide on the form of candidate oath, etc.
Title
Form of Candidate Oath
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#258 (Y: 100 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Ethics and Elections (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Ethics and Elections (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Chapter No. 2023-46 | |
2023-05-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-05-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2023-04-26 | House | CS passed; YEAS 100, NAYS 16 |
2023-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-25 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2023-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-25 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 707 |
2023-04-20 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-04-20 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023) |
2023-04-20 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-19 | House | In Messages |
2023-04-18 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/23 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/11/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/29/23, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-14 | Senate | CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/07/23, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Rules |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H707 (Same As) 2023-04-25 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 666 (Ch. 2023-46)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
99 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |