FL S0684 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing Medicaid to reimburse for dental services provided in a mobile dental unit that is owned by, operated by, or contracted with a health access setting or another similar setting or program; requiring the chair of the Board of Dentistry to appoint a Council on Dental Therapy effective after a specified timeframe; authorizing the board to require any person who applies to take the examination to practice dental therapy in this state to maintain medical malpractice insurance in a certain amount, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dental Therapy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/18/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building --Amendment(s) Adopted - Temporarily Postponed
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-02-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S686 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
H649 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
H471 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
409906Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4660075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4660136Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466017Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4660225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4660227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466028Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4660285Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466051Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback