FL S0698 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Chapter No. 2016-190, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7099 (Ch. 2016-220)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Chapter No. 2016-190, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7099 (Ch. 2016-220)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Division of Alcoholic Beverages and Tobacco to grant a one-time written waiver or extension of certain requirements to specified licensees; requiring an alcoholic beverage distributor to charge a deposit for certain alcoholic beverage sales; authorizing the division to issue temporary permits to charitable organizations, municipalities, and counties to sell alcoholic beverages for consumption on the premises of an event; authorizing a licensed distributor to transport alcoholic beverages through certain premises under specified circumstances, etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages and Tobacco
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#721 (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#721 (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Chapter No. 2016-190, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7099 (Ch. 2016-220) | |
2016-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-22 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2016-03-10 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 1 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (023647) 926 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | In returning messages |
2016-03-04 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 1 |
2016-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-03 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (481307, 873191) |
2016-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-03 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 1079 |
2016-03-01 | House | Received |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/16 |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2016-02-24 | House | In Messages |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2016-02-24 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (576758) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (284732, 319680, 421950, 423324, 462062, 598330) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/16 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Retained on Calendar |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/18/16 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/04/16, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 01/25/16, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-15 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-13 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/13/16, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2015-11-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1079 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 698 (Ch. 2016-190), HB 7099 (Ch. 2016-220)
H0645 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 698 (Ch. 2016-190)
S0934 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 698 (Ch. 2016-190)
H7099 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Chapter No. 2016-220, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 698 (Ch. 2016-190)
H0645 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 698 (Ch. 2016-190)
S0934 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 698 (Ch. 2016-190)
H7099 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Chapter No. 2016-220, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 698 (Ch. 2016-190)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 4205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
562 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
563 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
563 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
565 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
565 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |