FL S0706 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring swimming pools located on residential real property that is transferred or sold on or after a specified date to meet certain pool safety and pool barrier requirements; requiring certain persons to report violations of the law to a local law enforcement agency, etc.
Title
Residential Swimming Pool Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Rules |
2023-12-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H719 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
515 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
515 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
515 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/706 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/706/BillText/Filed/HTML |