FL S0710 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Redefining the term "practice of physical therapy"; providing that a licensed physical therapist who holds a specified doctoral degree may use specified letters in connection with her or his name or place of business; prohibiting a physical therapist with a specified doctoral degree from using the title "doctor" without informing the public of his or her profession as a physical therapist, etc.
Title
Physical Therapy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2015-04-08 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/07/15, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0515 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |