FL S0734 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting specified individuals from soliciting or accepting anything of value from a foreign country of concern; prohibiting a person from lobbying a county, municipality, or special district unless he or she is registered as a lobbyist with the Commission on Ethics; requiring the commission to investigate a lobbyist or principal upon receipt of a sworn complaint containing certain allegations; requiring the commission to provide the chief executive officer of the county or municipality or the governing body of the special district with a report on the findings and recommendations arising out of the investigation, etc.
Title
Government Accountability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Ethics and Elections (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2024-02-07 | Senate | CS/CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | CS/CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2024-01-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Now in Ethics and Elections |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Ethics and Elections; Appropriations |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Rules |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Ethics and Elections; Rules |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H735 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died on Third Reading Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 333 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 83 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 336 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3136 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3262 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 75 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 8014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
406 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |