FL S0738 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2017-84), CS/CS/HB 435 (Ch. 2017-83)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2017-84), CS/CS/HB 435 (Ch. 2017-83)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing exemptions from public records requirements for certain information held by the Office of Financial Regulation relating to international trust company representative offices or qualified limited service affiliates, respectively, and relating to affiliated international trust entities; providing future legislative review and repeal of the exemptions; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/International Financial Institutions
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Senate Banking and Insurance Committee | Sen. Debbie Mayfield [R] |
Sen. Greg Steube [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2017-84), CS/CS/HB 435 (Ch. 2017-83) |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 437 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/17 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/28/17, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2017-04-17 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/13/17, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-29 | Senate | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/27/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-08 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/06/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0736 (Related) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 435 (Ch. 2017-83), CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2017-84)
H0437 (Similar To) 2017-06-12 - Chapter No. 2017-84, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 435 (Ch. 2017-83)
H0435 (Similar To) 2017-06-12 - Chapter No. 2017-83, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2017-84)
H0771 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 435 (Ch. 2017-83), CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2017-84)
H0769 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 435 (Ch. 2017-83), CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2017-84)
S1078 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
S1080 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 435 (Ch. 2017-83), CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2017-84)
H0437 (Similar To) 2017-06-12 - Chapter No. 2017-84, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 435 (Ch. 2017-83)
H0435 (Similar To) 2017-06-12 - Chapter No. 2017-83, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2017-84)
H0771 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 435 (Ch. 2017-83), CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2017-84)
H0769 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 435 (Ch. 2017-83), CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2017-84)
S1078 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
S1080 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 435 (Ch. 2017-83), CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2017-84)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
119 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
663 | 416 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
663 | 540 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |