FL S0738 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Commissioner of Education, with the approval of the State Board of Education, to approve nonprofit athletic associations that meet certain requirements; defining the term "approved athletic association" and including the Florida High School Athletic Association within the meaning of that term; specifying that both private high schools and traditional public high schools are authorized to become members of an approved athletic association; providing that approved athletic associations are subject to certain requirements, etc.
Title
Athletic Associations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Education |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Referred to Education; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H443 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 468 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 795 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 796 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/738 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/738/BillText/Filed/HTML |