FL S0760 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "covered motor vehicle"; providing that there is no obligation or duty to retrofit a covered motor vehicle with component parts or equipment in certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Liability on Optional Equipment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1057 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/760 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/760/BillText/Filed/HTML |