FL S0794 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a governmental unit that contracts for the construction, repair, remodeling, or improving of a facility from imposing conditions that requires, prohibits, encourages, or discourages certain bidders, contractors, or subcontractors from entering into or adhering to agreements with a collective bargaining organization; prohibiting a governmental unit from granting certain awards as a condition of certain contracts; prohibiting certain terms from being placed in bid specifications, project agreements, or other controlling documents; revising the period during which an agency must file a protest following certain contract solicitations or awards, etc.
Title
Public Contracting
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Hays [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Budget | |
2012-02-17 | Now in Budget -SJ 523 | |
2012-02-16 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 9 NAYS 2 -SJ 523 | |
2012-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/16/12, 1:45 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-23 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 264 | |
2012-01-23 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 -SJ 264 | |
2012-01-18 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/23/12, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 67 | |
2011-11-16 | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 67 | |
2011-11-02 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/794 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0794/BillText/Filed/HTML |