FL S0802 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Redefining the term "design-build firm"; deleting a requirement that yacht and ship brokers maintain a separate license for each branch office and related fees; redefining the terms"building code administrator," "building official," and "building code inspector"; providing requirements for licensure by examination to practice restricted barbering; revising the process by which a business organization obtains the requisite license to perform architectural services, etc.
Title
Regulated Professions and Occupations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149) |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 7047 (Died in Senate returning Messages) |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/17 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-28 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/28/17, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2017-04-06 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/04/17, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/08/17, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1396 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Regulated Industries
H7047 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in returning Messages
S860 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died pending review, Rule 4.7(2), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
H909 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
S1372 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died pending review, Rule 4.7(2), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
H1021 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-149
H7047 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in returning Messages
S860 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died pending review, Rule 4.7(2), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
H909 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
S1372 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died pending review, Rule 4.7(2), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
H1021 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-149
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
287 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
326 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 381 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 382 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 384 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 3851 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 3852 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 3855 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 386 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 387 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 388 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 389 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 391 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 392 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 393 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 394 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 396 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 397 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 398 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 399 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 409 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 413 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 617 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
469 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
469 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
476 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
476 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
476 | 144 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 0132 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 0135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 019 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 0201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 219 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 229 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 319 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 329 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
548 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
548 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |