FL S0818 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Chapter No. 2017-22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Chapter No. 2017-22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "interestholder" to clarify that the term does not include certain parties to a certain multisite timeshare plan; revising requirements for the termination of a timeshare plan; specifying the percentage of votes required to extend the term of a timeshare plan under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Timeshares
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#256 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Chapter No. 2017-22 | |
2017-05-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-05-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2017-04-26 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-25 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 829 |
2017-04-20 | House | Received |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/17 |
2017-04-20 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | In Messages |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2017-04-19 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (942532) |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/06/17, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/22/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-15 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/08/17, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0829 (Similar To) 2017-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 818 (Ch. 2017-22)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
721 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
721 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
721 | 125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
721 | 1255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |