FL S0832 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the "Fantasy Contest Amusement Act"; creating the Office of Amusement within the Department of Business and Professional Regulation; providing licensing requirements for contest operators offering fantasy contests; requiring a contest operator to implement specified consumer protection procedures, etc.
Title
Fantasy Contests
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2016-02-02 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 2 |
2016-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/27/16, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0707 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
H7109 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
H7109 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
546 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
546 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
546 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
546 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
546 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
546 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
546 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
546 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
546 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
547 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
547 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
547 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
547 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |