FL S0918 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Health Regulation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Health Regulation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a state employee health and wellness clinic pilot program; providing conditions for the Division of State Group Insurance to select a vendor to manage the pilot program; specifying services to be provided by the pilot program; providing for location and hours of operation of pilot program clinics; providing for duration of the pilot program; requiring a report to the Governor and Legislature, etc.
Title
State Group Insurance Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Health Regulation | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 77 | |
2011-12-06 | Referred to Health Regulation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 77 | |
2011-11-14 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/918 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0918/BillText/Filed/HTML |