FL S0940 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that a student who is withdrawing from school be assigned a counselor or other school personnel to provide educational information until the student is 18 years of age. Requires that 9th grade students in their second semester and students who are withdrawing from school receive detailed instruction regarding the effects of withdrawing from high school without graduating and certain available options.
Title
School Attendance/Withdrawal from School [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations -SJ 00067 | |
2010-01-14 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations | |
2009-12-15 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 428 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |