FL S0968 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the method for calculating the amount of tax and discretionary sales surtax, etc.
Title
Sales and Use Tax
Sponsors
Sen. John Legg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2015-11-30 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/968 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0968/BillText/Filed/HTML |