FL S0970 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the principals of certain public elementary schools to take specified actions to facilitate communication and collaboration with private prekindergarten providers; requiring the Office of Early Learning and early learning coalitions to provide specified support to such school principals, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voluntary Prekindergarten Education Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Education
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-02-12SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H871 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100278Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback