FL S0972 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "common element" for purposes of prorating ad valorem taxes for certain properties under certain circumstances; establishing deadlines for value adjustment boards to hear petitions and issue the second tax roll certification; authorizing the district school board and county commission to audit certain expenses of the value adjustment board; requiring a property appraiser to notify a petitioner when property record cards are available online, etc.
Title
Ad Valorem Taxation
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Finance and Tax Committee | Sen. Anitere Flores [R] | Sen. Gwen Margolis [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Messages |
2015-04-28 | House | In Messages |
2015-04-28 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/15 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/16/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-04-01 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/30/15, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/17/15, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0695 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
192 | 0105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
193 | 0235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
193 | 122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 038 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
195 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |