FL S0974 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing any motor vehicle to be equipped with certain lamps or devices under certain circumstances; authorizing certain vehicles to display red and white warning signals under certain circumstances; authorizing an insurance company to provide an independent entity with a certain release statement authorizing it to release a vehicle to the lienholder, etc.
Title
Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92) |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 1057 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/11/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/04/19, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-14 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1057 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-92
S660 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 311 (Ch. 2019-101), CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
S1158 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
S1232 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 301 (Ch. 2019-108), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
H1053 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
S660 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 311 (Ch. 2019-101), CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
S1158 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
S1232 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 301 (Ch. 2019-108), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
H1053 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 224 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 2397 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 2398 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
319 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |