FL S0976 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the State Constitution to require the State Board of Education to direct the Department of Education to establish a statewide system for the approval of charter schools within the state, etc.
Title
Charter Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Education Pre-K - 12 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 02/02/16, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Rules |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0759 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/976 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0976/BillText/Filed/HTML |