FL S0980 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that all plans submitted on or after a specified date for construction of a pedestrian crosswalk on a public highway, street, or road which is located at any point other than at an intersection with another public highway, street, or road must include traffic control signal devices and pedestrian control signals that conform to specified requirements; providing coordination requirements for such devices and signals requiring that such devices and signals be coordinated to meet specified requirements, etc.
Title
Traffic and Pedestrian Safety
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/980 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/980/BillText/Filed/HTML |