FL S0986 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 613 (Ch. 2016-56)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 613 (Ch. 2016-56)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting a required item to be listed on a notice of election to be exempt; requiring that the Department of Financial Services allow an employer who has not previously been issued an order of penalty assessment to receive a specified credit to be applied to the penalty; eliminating the certification requirements when an expert medical advisor is selected by a judge of compensation claims; deleting the requirement that employers notify the department within 24 hours of any injury resulting in death, etc.
Title
Workers' Compensation System Administration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 613 (Ch. 2016-56) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 613 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/16 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/25/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 02/17/16, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-09 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/01/16, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/26/16, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0613 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Chapter No. 2016-56
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
440 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 4626 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |