FL S0988 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 733 -SJ 733
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 733 -SJ 733
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excluding real property owned in tenancy by the entireties or in joint tenancy with rights of survivorship from the definition of the term "protected homestead"; clarifying the application of amendments to s. 732.102, F.S., made by chapter 2011-183, Laws of Florida, relating to a spouse's share of an intestate estate; revising the period of time during which an attorney in fact or guardian of the property of a surviving spouse may petition for approval to elect to take a one-half interest in the decedent's homestead; specifying the minimum duration of an extension of time; barring inheritance rights of a natural or adoptive parent whose parental rights have been previously terminated pursuant to law; providing for application of the act, etc.
Title
Probate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Laid on Table, refer to HB 733 -SJ 733 | |
2012-03-01 | Read 2nd time -SJ 733 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/12 | |
2012-01-19 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 252 | |
2012-01-19 | Favorable by- Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 252 | |
2012-01-13 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/19/12, 10:15 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 82 | |
2011-12-06 | Referred to Judiciary -SJ 82 | |
2011-11-16 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
731 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 1081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/988 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0988/BillText/Filed/HTML |