FL S1006 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting a law enforcement officer to rely on information received from a first responder at the scene of a traffic crash to arrest a person for specified violations without a warrant, etc.
Title
Warrantless Arrests
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Hays [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Fiscal Policy |
2015-12-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0507 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1006 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1006/BillText/Filed/HTML |