FL S1014 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2017-179), CS/CS/CS/HB 1007 (Ch. 2017-178)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2017-179), CS/CS/CS/HB 1007 (Ch. 2017-178)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for reports, documents, or other information relating to the investigation and tracking of insurance fraud submitted by insurers to the Department of Financial Services; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Investigation and Tracking of Insurance Fraud/Department of Financial Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2017-179), CS/CS/CS/HB 1007 (Ch. 2017-178) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 1009 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/17 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/17, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/17/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2017-04-05 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/03/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1012 (Related) 2017-05-05 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1007 (Ch. 2017-178), CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2017-179)
H1009 (Similar To) 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-179, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1007 (Ch. 2017-178)
H1007 (Similar To) 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-178, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2017-179)
H1009 (Similar To) 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-179, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1007 (Ch. 2017-178)
H1007 (Similar To) 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-178, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1009 (Ch. 2017-179)