FL S1024 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-187
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-187
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the terms "ATV" and "ROV"; revising a violation for carrying an operator and more than a single passenger on certain off-highway vehicles to prohibit carrying more passengers than the vehicle is designed to carry; amending a penalty provision to apply to off-highway vehicles; revising the term "all-terrain vehicle", etc.
Title
Off-highway Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#805 (Y: 83 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Chapter No. 2014-187 | |
2014-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-28 | House | CS passed; YEAS 83 NAYS 34 |
2014-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-28 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-28 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 1193 |
2014-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-25 | House | Received |
2014-04-25 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/14 |
2014-04-25 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2014-04-24 | House | In Messages |
2014-04-23 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (258044) |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/11/14 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable by- Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/31/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2014-03-17 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/13/14, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Commerce and Tourism |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1193 (Similar To) 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1024 (Ch. 2014-187)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
261 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
261 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 2074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
317 | 0003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |