FL S1028 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising provisions relating to specified photographs and maps prescribed and furnished by the Department of Revenue to property appraisers to ensure property is properly listed on the tax rolls; requiring the department to pay for such photographs and maps; deleting provisions that required property appraisers in counties with a specified population to pay for the photographs and maps, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Assessment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-01SenateDied in Finance and Tax
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-27SenateReferred to Finance and Tax; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2015-02-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0843 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
195022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
195087Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback