FL S1030 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a county or school board to exclude rent or license fees from the discretionary sales surtaxes imposed, under certain circumstances; specifying the application of an exemption for sales taxes for certain purchasers of boats and aircraft; authorizing the department to consider requests to settle or compromise certain liabilities after certain time periods have expired, in certain circumstances; providing a limitation; providing that certain department decisions are not subject to review, etc.
Title
Taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance and Tax (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2024-02-20 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/13/24, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/16/24, 11:00 am, 401 Senate Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2023-12-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1001 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
S7074 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7073
H7073 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
S7074 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7073
H7073 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
206 | 9931 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |