FL S1060 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Education Pre-K -12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Education Pre-K -12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to remove provisions and apply certain requirements on the change in assessment of real property and residential real property to school district levies and to provide an effective date, etc.
Title
Assessments for School District Levies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Education Pre-K -12 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1062 (Related) 2024-03-08 - Died in Education Pre-K -12
H331 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
H333 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
H331 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
H333 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1060 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1060/BillText/Filed/HTML |