FL S1068 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 763 -SJ 1271
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying that a vehicle may not be operated after expiration of the renewal period or, for a natural person, after midnight on the owner's birthday unless the registration was renewed before then; authorizing a person who has renewed a vehicle registration during an early registration period to apply for a refund of specified license taxes upon surrendering the registration license plate before the end of the renewal period, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Registration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Laid on Table, refer to HB 763 -SJ 1271
2012-03-09 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/12 -SJ 1270
2012-03-06 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 902
2012-03-06 Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 902
2012-02-29 Now in Budget -SJ 721
2012-02-28 Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2012-02-23 On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations, 02/28/12, 2:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2012-01-23 Now in Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations
2012-01-23 Now in Budget -SJ 263
2012-01-19 Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 263
2012-01-13 On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/19/12, 8:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2012-01-10 Introduced -SJ 87
2012-01-10 Referred to Transportation; Budget -SJ 87
2011-11-28 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32015Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback