FL S1084 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Preempting the regulation of electric vehicle charging stations to the state; prohibiting local governmental entities from enacting or enforcing such regulations; providing that a pest control operator's certificate, a special identification card, and certain limited certifications for pesticide applicators, respectively, expire a specified length of time after issuance; authorizing the department to take disciplinary action against a person who swears to or affirms a false statement on certain applications, cheats on a required examination, or violates certain procedures under certain circumstances; authorizing Class "G" licensees to qualify for multiple calibers of firearms in one requalification class under certain circumstances; prohibiting the manufacture for sale, sale, holding or offering for sale, or distribution of cultivated meat in this state, etc.
Title
Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services
Sponsors
Senate Fiscal Policy Committee | Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | Sen. Jay Collins [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#886 (Y: 86 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#30 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Agriculture (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#30 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Agriculture (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-06 | House | CS passed; YEAS 86, NAYS 27 |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Amendment 647669 Failed |
2024-03-05 | House | Amendment 322827 Failed |
2024-03-05 | House | Amendment 552895 Failed |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024) |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | In Messages |
2024-02-29 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 26 NAYS 10 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (875192) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (626714) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) failed (343968) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/24 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 11 NAYS 4 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-02-13 | Senate | CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government read 1st time |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/08/24, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/16/24, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2023-12-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H119 (Similar To) 2024-01-02 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H435 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
S188 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Agriculture
S586 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Agriculture
H1071 (Same As) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
H435 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
S188 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Agriculture
S586 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Agriculture
H1071 (Same As) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 94 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 3004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 382 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
482 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
482 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
482 | 155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
482 | 156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
482 | 157 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
482 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
482 | 191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
482 | 226 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
487 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
487 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6127 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
496 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
496 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
496 | 4055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
496 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
496 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
496 | 409 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
496 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
496 | 4101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
496 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
496 | 4121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
496 | 425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 452 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
507 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
531 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
534 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 904 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 907 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 69 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 691 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 692 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
581 | 189 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
585 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
767 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
767 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 0625 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
810 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
810 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |