FL S1102 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing certain organizations to establish programs for the purpose of assisting parents and legal guardians in providing temporary respite care for a child; restricting care to specified children; providing that placement of a child in temporary respite care does not, in the absence of evidence to the contrary, constitute abuse, neglect, or abandonment or placement in foster care; authorizing the Department of Children and Families to refer children to such programs under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Temporary Care of a Child
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2016-02-09 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/04/16, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2015-12-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0259 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1761 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
709 | 2209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |