FL S1106 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising certain minimum replacement costs as risk amounts ineligible for coverage by Citizens Property Insurance Corporation for personal lines residential structures; providing exceptions to rate increase limitations on single policies issued by the corporation; requiring surcharges for a specified purpose for policies covering certain personal lines residential structures, etc.
Title
Coverage by Citizens Property Insurance Corporation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/13/24, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2024-01-18 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-16 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/16/24, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2023-12-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H889 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee