FL S1174 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 508
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 508
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Redistricting the state's congressional districts in accordance with the United States Decennial Census of 2010 (plan H000C9047); amending provisions relating to the inclusion of unlisted territory in contiguous districts; reenacting provisions which provide for the election of representatives to the United States House of Representatives; providing for severability; providing for applicability, etc.
Title
Establishing the Congressional Districts of the State
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#671 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#672 (Y: 80 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#662 (Y: 80 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#661 (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#672 (Y: 80 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#662 (Y: 80 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#661 (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 508 | |
2012-02-09 | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (832579) -SJ 358, 405 | |
2012-02-08 | In returning messages | |
2012-02-03 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 80 NAYS 37 -HJ 473 | |
2012-02-03 | Read 3rd time -HJ 472 | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-02 | Read 2nd time -HJ 399 | |
2012-01-30 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/02/12 | |
2012-01-30 | Received -HJ 286, 302 | |
2012-01-27 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 286, 302 | |
2012-01-17 | In Messages | |
2012-01-17 | Immediately certified -SJ 213 | |
2012-01-17 | Read 2nd time -SJ 171 | |
2012-01-13 | CS by Reapportionment read 1st time -SJ 166 | |
2012-01-12 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/17/12 | |
2012-01-11 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 136 | |
2012-01-11 | CS by- Reapportionment; YEAS 21 NAYS 5 -SJ 136 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 95 | |
2011-12-30 | On Committee agenda-- Reapportionment, 01/11/12, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-12-16 | Referred to Reapportionment -SJ 95 | |
2011-12-06 | Filed | |
2011-12-06 | SPB 7032 submitted as a committee bill (SB 1174) by Reapportionment |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 0001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 0002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 0111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 0611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |