FL S1184 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying that a financial institution is not prohibited from disclosing specified information to certain persons relating to deceased account holders; authorizing a financial institution to pay to the authorized family member of a decedent depositor, without any court proceeding, order, or judgment authorizing the payment and not earlier than a specified time, the funds in the decedent's qualified accounts if the sum does not exceed a specified amount; requiring the authorized family member to provide the financial institution a certified copy of the decedent's death certificate and a specified affidavit in order to receive the funds, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bank Property of Deceased Accountholders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Judiciary
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-14SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2019-03-13SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-03-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-11SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-03-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/11/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
2019-02-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H837 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
655059Amended CodeSee Bill Text
655795Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback